U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00262-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GOMEZ-SUAREZ
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • March 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 03, 2022: [Sentencing]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • January 26, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 21, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 18, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 17, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • October 07, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • September 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice-Other]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 28, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • July 27, 2021: [Indictment]
  • July 26, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.