U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00266-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TOOMER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • October 20, 2022: [USCA Opinion]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit]
  • July 15, 2022: [SEALED Reason for Amendment]
  • July 15, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • July 15, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order]
  • April 18, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • April 14, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • April 13, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • April 13, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • January 28, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 28, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • January 24, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 11, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 10, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 01, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 01, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • October 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 26, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • October 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 04, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 01, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • October 01, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • October 01, 2021: [Arrest]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.