U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00265-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILLIAMS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Transcript]
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • March 26, 2025: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • March 26, 2025: [Request]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • March 11, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 04, 2022: [Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 25, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 25, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 21, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 14, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • January 10, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 06, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • October 07, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • September 29, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 28, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 28, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 19, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • August 19, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 16, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • August 16, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • August 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 16, 2021: [Arrest]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.