U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00264-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GAILLARD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [SEALED Transcript]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Transcript]
  • December 13, 2022: [Transcript]
  • December 09, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • September 08, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • September 06, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • August 18, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 17, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • August 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • August 10, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • June 08, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • June 08, 2022: [Seal ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 18, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order]
  • March 15, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 15, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 08, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • March 01, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 01, 2022: [Continue Trial]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Status Report ]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Response to Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • December 21, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • December 20, 2021: [Suppress]
  • December 20, 2021: [Extension of Time To File Motion]
  • December 20, 2021: [Continue Trial]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of Special Appearance]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 20, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 19, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • September 01, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 26, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • August 26, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • August 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 26, 2021: [Arrest]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.