U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00263-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SCHNELLE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [SEALED Reason for Amendment]
  • May 27, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • March 11, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • February 24, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 17, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • February 12, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Declaration]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 18, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • October 18, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 16, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • October 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 01, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • August 03, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • August 02, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • July 28, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • July 28, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • July 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 28, 2021: [Arrest]
  • July 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.