U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00271-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HUDSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • September 27, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 04, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • July 22, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • July 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • July 11, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Revised Final]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • February 08, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 08, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • February 03, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 28, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 14, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • October 18, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 01, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 31, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 25, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.