U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00270-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SWANN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Preliminary Revocation and Detention Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • April 02, 2025: [SEALED USPO Amended Petition]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • March 27, 2025: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 26, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Violators]
  • March 26, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 20, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 03, 2021: [Sentencing]
November, 2021
  • November 26, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • November 10, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 08, 2021: [Final Order of Forfeiture]
  • November 08, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 19, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Order]
  • September 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 09, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 31, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • August 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 06, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • August 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 06, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • August 05, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 30, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • July 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 30, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • July 30, 2021: [Arrest]
  • July 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.