U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00269-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GUASP
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • February 02, 2022: [Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 04, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • December 28, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 28, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 22, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 14, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order]
  • October 14, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • October 14, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • September 29, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 31, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 31, 2021: [Waiver-Other]
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 26, 2021: [Appearance Bond]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 26, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • August 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 26, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 26, 2021: [Arrest]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 28, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.