U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00268-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BARNHARDT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 08, 2024: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • August 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 04, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 03, 2022: [SEALED Document]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • July 11, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 05, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • April 01, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 23, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 07, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 03, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • December 30, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • December 23, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 01, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 01, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • December 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 01, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 01, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • December 01, 2021: [Arrest]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.