U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00096-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alford
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Document]
  • December 07, 2022: [Document]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • June 13, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Sentencing ]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Departure - Sentencing Guidelines]
  • May 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • May 24, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • May 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • March 09, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • March 09, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 29, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 22, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • November 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • October 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Text Order]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • September 30, 2021: [Detention]
  • September 30, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 30, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • July 28, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • July 28, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 28, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • July 28, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.