U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Graham et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Probation Report - Amendment 821 - Criminal History]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 02, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • May 02, 2025: [Vacate (2255) ]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Vacate (2255) ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 03, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Special Appearance - Defendant - Non-District Counsel]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [USCA Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [USCA Case Number ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 19, 2023: [Judgment ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • January 12, 2023: [Continue Sentencing]
  • January 10, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • December 20, 2022: [Statement Regarding Substantial Assistance]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 19, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 16, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 14, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • December 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 07, 2022: [Extension of Time]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Strike ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • November 18, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • November 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • November 10, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 21, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 21, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 17, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 22, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • August 05, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • July 19, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support]
  • July 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 06, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • June 27, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 24, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 23, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • May 23, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 23, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • May 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel- Defendant]
  • April 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • April 07, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 04, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • March 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 28, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 25, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • March 03, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Bond ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • February 11, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 09, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Text Order]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 08, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 08, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 07, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 31, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 03, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 04, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 04, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 17, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • September 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 10, 2021: [Text Order]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • September 10, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • September 10, 2021: [Detention]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 10, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 28, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 28, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 28, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • July 28, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.