U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Herbert
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice-other]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 03, 2023: [Document]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 09, 2022: [Document]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Sentencing ]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 29, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 11, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 19, 2022: [Text Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • April 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • March 21, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 28, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • July 28, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 28, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • July 28, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.