U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00308-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 21, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 20, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 17, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 14, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 12, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • November 16, 2021: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
  • November 12, 2021: [Bond Hearing ]
  • November 04, 2021: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • October 21, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 19, 2021: [Release Status Report]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 09, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • September 08, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 20, 2021: [Text Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 16, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 16, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • August 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 13, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 13, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order]
  • August 11, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 11, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 11, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.