U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00307-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 16, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • June 17, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 14, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • May 23, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • May 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Document]
  • March 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • March 17, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
February, 2022
  • February 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Document]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Ex Parte Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Letter]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 08, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 07, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 07, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 05, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 04, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 04, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.