U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00306-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Patterson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for 5K Departure]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • July 11, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • July 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • April 07, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 01, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Extension of Time]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 19, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 05, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • September 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 22, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • September 20, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • September 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • September 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order]
  • September 15, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • September 15, 2021: [Detention]
  • September 15, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • September 13, 2021: [Text Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 29, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • July 29, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.