U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00303-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Borkowski
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Judgment ]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 26, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • February 16, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 14, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 22, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • September 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • September 16, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • September 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order]
  • September 15, 2021: [Detention]
  • September 15, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • September 15, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Text Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • July 29, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.