U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00302-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Artis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 17, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 10, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • December 01, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • August 26, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • August 24, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 09, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • July 01, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 30, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • May 17, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 10, 2022: [Extension of Time]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • April 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • March 23, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 23, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • March 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • January 18, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Order]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 13, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • August 12, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 10, 2021: [Text Order]
  • August 10, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • August 10, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 10, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 10, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 29, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.