U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00301-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pelacious et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on SEALED Motion]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 24, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • October 24, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on SEALED Motion]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Seal ]
  • October 17, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • October 17, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 13, 2022: [Seal ]
  • October 13, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • July 07, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • June 08, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • June 08, 2022: [Docket Call]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • May 27, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • May 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • April 25, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 14, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 08, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 14, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 10, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • December 08, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 12, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 12, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 12, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 20, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • October 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 11, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • October 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • October 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 06, 2021: [Detention]
  • October 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Arrest ]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 27, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 31, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • August 24, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • August 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 17, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 17, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 13, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order]
  • August 11, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 11, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 11, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Text Order]
  • August 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • July 29, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.