U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00300-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Adler
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice-other]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • July 21, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 12, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 12, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 06, 2022: [Release Status Report]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 17, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • February 09, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • February 07, 2022: [Release Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 22, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • October 22, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 22, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • October 22, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Motion Hearing ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • August 13, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • August 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 06, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Text Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 03, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 03, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 29, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.