U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00299-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wallace
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice-other]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • December 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • December 28, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 27, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 27, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 27, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 14, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • October 20, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • August 16, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 16, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 12, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 11, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 11, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 11, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.