U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00298-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Braswell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 24, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • January 18, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Motion Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 04, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 04, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 16, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • September 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 03, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • September 03, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • September 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [Detention]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 02, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.