U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00297-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 24, 2023: [Objection to PSI]
  • January 23, 2023: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 20, 2023: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 20, 2023: [Objection to PSI]
  • January 09, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 08, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Release Status Report]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 08, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 08, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 08, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 03, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.