U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00273-1
  • Case Name: USA v. NORMAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
  • July 14, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order]
  • May 31, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • May 27, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • May 20, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • May 20, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • March 16, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • March 08, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 17, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • January 25, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • January 22, 2022: [SEALED USPO Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 20, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 18, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • January 10, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 20, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • October 04, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • September 24, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • August 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • August 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 30, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • July 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 30, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 30, 2021: [Arrest]
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.