U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00304-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reynaga et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 06, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2025: [Judgment on 2255]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 11, 2025: [Judgment on Motion to Vacate (2255) ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice-other]
  • March 25, 2025: [Probation Report - Amendment 821 - Criminal History]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to 23-SO-6]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance Pursuant to 23-SO-6]
  • March 14, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney Regarding 23-SO-6]
  • March 12, 2025: [Probation Report - Amendment 821 - Criminal History]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Document]
  • October 04, 2024: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Objection to PSI]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 03, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Extension of Time]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Seal ]
  • December 28, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 23, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 10, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 27, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 05, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • October 05, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 29, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • September 19, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 25, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • July 18, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 16, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 15, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • June 14, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 14, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • June 03, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • June 02, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • June 01, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • June 01, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Transcript]
  • May 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Transcript]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Seal ]
  • May 09, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • May 09, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 05, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • May 05, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • May 05, 2022: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • May 04, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • May 03, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 01, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 01, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • April 26, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 21, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • March 25, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • March 22, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 18, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 04, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 24, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • February 16, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • February 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 07, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 18, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 10, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 16, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 08, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 08, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 28, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 16, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • November 15, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 12, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 11, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Text Order]
  • November 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 05, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • November 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 03, 2021: [Detention]
  • November 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 03, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • October 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 13, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • October 12, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 12, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 12, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Text Order]
  • October 11, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 08, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • October 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • October 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • October 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [Detention]
  • October 06, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice-other]
  • October 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 29, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • September 28, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • September 24, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • September 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 23, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • September 23, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • September 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Text Order]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • September 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 21, 2021: [Detention]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 21, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 18, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • September 17, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • September 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 16, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • September 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order]
  • September 15, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • September 15, 2021: [Detention]
  • September 15, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • September 13, 2021: [Text Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 08, 2021: [Transcript]
  • September 08, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 08, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 07, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice-other]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 24, 2021: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Order]
  • August 23, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • August 20, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 19, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • August 19, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 18, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 18, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 16, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 16, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order]
  • August 11, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • August 11, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 11, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Text Order]
  • August 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • July 29, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 29, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.