U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00310-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez-Landron et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Sentencing ]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • March 29, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • March 25, 2022: [Transcript]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • February 18, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 18, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 09, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • December 16, 2021: [Transcript]
  • December 10, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 08, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 20, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • September 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • September 06, 2021: [Bond ]
  • September 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 03, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • September 02, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • September 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order]
  • September 01, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • September 01, 2021: [Detention]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 01, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.