U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00309-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Goddard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Correction]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Seal ]
  • October 05, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • December 14, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • December 14, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • December 14, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 16, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Text Order]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 25, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • August 25, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • August 24, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 24, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • August 24, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 23, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 20, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 19, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 16, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • August 16, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 29, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.