U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00183-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pittman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • October 22, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 22, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • October 22, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 14, 2021: [Factual Basis]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Prob49 or 42A - Waiver of Hearing]
  • September 09, 2021: [ProbPS42 - Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 17, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 04, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 04, 2021: [Bond]
  • August 04, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • August 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 03, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 30, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 30, 2021: [Arrest]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • July 30, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • July 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.