U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:08-cr-00155-1
  • Case Name: USA v. REYES-MARQUEZ
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • September 27, 2022: [USCA Opinion]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit]
  • June 10, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • June 07, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order re Compassionate Release - 18:3582]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [SEALED Attachments to Main Document]
  • March 28, 2022: [Reduce Sentence re Compassionate Release - 18:3582]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Order re Compassionate Release - 18:3582]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 04, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 03, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • August 02, 2021: [Reduce Sentence re Compassionate Release - 18:3582]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.