U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moody
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 02, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 02, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 10, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Sequester]
  • January 05, 2023: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • January 05, 2023: [Sequester]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 09, 2022: [Detention]
  • December 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 09, 2022: [Text Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 02, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Probation]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.