U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pilkington
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Treatment ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Psychiatric Treatment ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • July 01, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • June 22, 2022: [Expedite ]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Competency Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Telephone Conference ]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Examination]
  • September 29, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 28, 2021: [Psychiatric Examination]
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 17, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • August 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • August 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 12, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 11, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 10, 2021: [Text Order]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 10, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 10, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 10, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 05, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • August 03, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 03, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 03, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • August 03, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.