U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00160-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramirez-Negron
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • January 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • October 20, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • October 20, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • October 20, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 19, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • August 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 06, 2021: [Text Order]
  • August 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 06, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 04, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • August 04, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.