U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jackson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • July 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 19, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 11, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • January 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • January 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 01, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 01, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • December 01, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 01, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • November 19, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • November 19, 2021: [Dismiss]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 24, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Arrest]
  • August 31, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 06, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • August 05, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 04, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 04, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.