U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Humphreys
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • February 02, 2022: [Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 26, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • January 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • January 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 08, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • October 08, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 08, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • October 07, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • October 05, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • October 05, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 21, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 10, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 09, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • August 09, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • August 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 09, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 09, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • August 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 05, 2021: [Arrest]
  • August 04, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 04, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.