U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lewis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • December 07, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Seal]
  • November 28, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • November 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • November 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 22, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 08, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Service by Publication]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • May 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • March 21, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • March 21, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • March 21, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • March 11, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • March 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 29, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 27, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 09, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • August 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 09, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 04, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.