U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sadongei
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Response - other]
  • December 16, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • December 02, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment/Execution and Instructions]
  • December 02, 2022: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • December 01, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • December 01, 2022: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • October 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 03, 2022: [Sentencing]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • September 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • September 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 08, 2022: [Service by Publication]
  • September 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • July 25, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • July 25, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • July 25, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • July 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • July 19, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • July 19, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Reset Docket Call and Excludable]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 19, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 19, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 18, 2022: [Appear]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 14, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • January 18, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 22, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 20, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Arrest]
  • August 31, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 28, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 06, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • August 05, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 04, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 04, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.