U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:07-cr-00252-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PANKEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 10, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of Prob/SR]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - Sentencing]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 02, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • September 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Violators]
  • September 02, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • September 02, 2021: [Arrest]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • August 05, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • August 05, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 05, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • August 04, 2021: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • August 04, 2021: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.