U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Belcher, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • November 12, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 12, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 24, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 24, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • August 24, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 24, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 24, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.