U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00487-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pelayo, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
  • March 31, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to 23-SO-6]
October, 2024
  • October 27, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • April 12, 2022: [Sentencing ]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice-other]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Sentencing ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • November 02, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • November 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • October 29, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 18, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 04, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 13, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 13, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • September 08, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice-other]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 27, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 09, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 09, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 06, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.