U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00157-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dolores-Juarez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Sentencing ]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • October 01, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 17, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • August 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 13, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 10, 2021: [Text Order]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 10, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 10, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 10, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 09, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.