U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00315-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • February 02, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 21, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • October 06, 2021: [Document]
  • October 04, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • October 01, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 23, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • September 22, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice to Counsel]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • August 09, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 09, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.