U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MACK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 13, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 10, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • August 10, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 09, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 09, 2021: [Reduce Sentence re Compassionate Release - 18:3582]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.