U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00192-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Grullon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • February 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 15, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 14, 2022: [Exhibit]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 10, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • February 10, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • February 09, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • February 09, 2022: [Seal]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time re: Other]
  • February 08, 2022: [Extension of Time re: Other]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • December 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • December 03, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 02, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 15, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 15, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • October 15, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 11, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • August 11, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 10, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 09, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.