U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00191-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bowden
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • June 01, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Sentencing]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 21, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • March 04, 2022: [Continue Other]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 04, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 23, 2021: [Service by Publication]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 18, 2021: [USDOJ Return of Service]
  • August 17, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 17, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 17, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • August 17, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • August 17, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • August 17, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 11, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 10, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • August 10, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 09, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.