U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00278-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BARNETTE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of Prob/SR]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - Sentencing]
  • October 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 04, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation and Detention Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • September 27, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • September 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Violators]
  • September 27, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • September 26, 2022: [Arrest]
  • September 19, 2022: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • September 16, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • September 08, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • September 08, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
  • September 08, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • September 08, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release/Probation Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.