U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00319-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kornegay et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to 23-SO-6]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Restricted Sentencing Statement]
  • January 20, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 28, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • December 12, 2022: [Document]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing ]
  • October 19, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Sentencing ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • August 12, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • August 12, 2022: [Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • August 02, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • July 22, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 22, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 22, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 17, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • May 12, 2022: [Document]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • April 21, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • March 24, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 03, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 18, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 11, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • January 17, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • December 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 07, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 07, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 20, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 20, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 26, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 20, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 19, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 18, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 18, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • August 18, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 17, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 17, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • August 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 17, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 16, 2021: [Text Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 16, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 11, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 11, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.