U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00320-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnston
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 18, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Sentencing ]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 27, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 14, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • October 20, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 17, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 17, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 19, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 18, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2021: [Text Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 16, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 16, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 11, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 11, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • August 11, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.