U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00318-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hunt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 29, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • September 29, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • September 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • May 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • April 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 08, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 16, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 11, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.