U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Huffman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 03, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • June 08, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • June 08, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • May 27, 2022: [Sentencing ]
March, 2022
  • March 20, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • March 20, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • March 04, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • March 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 16, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • December 17, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 17, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • November 17, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • November 17, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • November 17, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 09, 2021: [Release Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • September 23, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 16, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • September 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 15, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 15, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • September 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • September 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 02, 2021: [Text Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • September 02, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [Detention]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 30, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 27, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 11, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • August 11, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.