U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00279-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GOMEZ
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • April 22, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • April 22, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 21, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 20, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 07, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 06, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 20, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 20, 2021: [Arraignment Without Judge Time]
  • August 20, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 20, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • August 12, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • August 11, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • August 11, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • August 11, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.