U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-00071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alexander
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 12, 2022: [Annual Accounting of Garnishment]
  • January 12, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • January 12, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2021: [Motions Referred]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • November 30, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • October 07, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 05, 2021: [Instruction to Defendant and Notice of Post-Judgment Proceedings]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order/Writ on Motion for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • September 30, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.